EP2052801 - Adapter for a tool holder with a cooling system using a minimum amount of lubricant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAIP, S.A. Arzubia Kalea 2 B[deg] Matiena 48220 Abadiano / ES | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larraskitu Bernaola, Aitor Arzubia Kalea, 2 - B Matiena 48220 Abadiano (Bizkaia) / ES | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel Consultores Urizar y Cia, S.L. Gordoniz 22 5[deg] 48012 Bilbao Vizcaya / ES | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/18] | Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel Gordóniz 22, 5 48012 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES | Application number, filing date | 08380040.9 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | ES20070002469P | 18.09.2007 Original published format: ES 200702469 P | [2009/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052801 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/02 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B23B31/028 (EP);
B23B2231/04 (EP);
B23B2250/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Adapter für Werkzeughalter mit Kühlsystem, bei dem eine Mindestmenge an Schmiermittel zum Einsatz kommt | [2009/18] | English: | Adapter for a tool holder with a cooling system using a minimum amount of lubricant | [2009/18] | French: | Adaptateur pour porte-outils à système de refroidissement employant une quantité minime de lubrifiant | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102005013483 (FRANZ HAIMER MASCHB KG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1813369 (BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE10312743 (GUEHRING JOERG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure 2 * |