EP2003267 - Dilation joint for flooring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promociones Brial, S.L. Pérez Bayer 16 - Entresuelo B1 Dcha. 12540 Villareal (Castellón) / ES | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Llorens Miravet, Salvator Pérez Bayer, 16 - Entresuelo Bl Dcha. 12540 Villarreal (Castellón) / ES | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08380169.6 | 04.06.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | ES20070001615 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: ES 200701615 | ES20080001626 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: ES 200801626 | [2008/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003267 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2003267 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/06, E04F15/02, E04B1/68 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
E04F19/062 (EP);
E04F15/02022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | E04F19/06 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/46] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dehnungsfuge für einen Fussboden | [2008/51] | English: | Dilation joint for flooring | [2008/51] | French: | Joint de dilatation pour plancher | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE2835054 (SCHULTE STEMMERK KG) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph last * * page 12, paragraph last * * page 13, paragraph last - page 14, paragraph 2 * [Y] 4 [I] 3; | [Y]EP0898031 (NOLTE FRIEDHELM [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006003691 (ECOLEGNO SNC [IT], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015]; figures 1-12 * |