EP2191906 - Roller profiling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valle Perfiladoras y LÍneas Especiales, S.L. Zona Industrial De Mar C/ Rolisas C6 39318 Mar-Polanco (Cantabria) / ES | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valle Cayón, D. José María Avda. de España N[deg]8-2[deg]C 39300 Torrelavega / ES | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Goya 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08380327.0 | 28.11.2008 | [2010/22] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191906 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191906 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/08 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B21D5/083 (EP,US);
B21D5/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Extension states | AL | 07.06.2010 | BA | 07.06.2010 | MK | 07.06.2010 | RS | 07.06.2010 | Title | German: | Walzenprofilierungsmaschine | [2010/22] | English: | Roller profiling machine | [2010/22] | French: | Machine de profilage à rouleaux | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | GR | 22.12.2010 | HR | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | NO | 22.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5722278 (HORINO KATUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]DE10011755 (GROCHE PTU TU DARMSTADT PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004040257 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |