EP2161460 - Contactless position sensor with displacement transmission structure and displacement transmission structure therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/10] | Contactless position sensor with displacement transmission structure and displacement transmission structur therefor | ||
[2010/14] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH Ampèrestrasse 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP España S.A. Muntaner 249, 5a planta 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reifel, Dirk 32, Rue du Clos des Vignes 95610, Eragny-sur-Oise / FR | 02 /
Munzig, Thorsten Im Schalg 11 69245, Bammental / DE | 03 /
Carbó, Albert c. Muntaner, 256 2-2 08021, Barcelona / ES | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08382034.0 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161460 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/10, F15B15/28 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
F15B15/10 (EP);
F15B15/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Berührungsloser Positionssensor mit Bewegungsübertragungsstruktur und Bewegungsübertragungsstruktur dafür | [2010/10] | English: | Contactless position sensor with displacement transmission structure and displacement transmission structure therefor | [2010/14] | French: | Détecteur de position sans contact avec structure de transmission de mouvement et sa structure de transmission de mouvement | [2010/10] |
Former [2010/10] | Contactless position sensor with displacement transmission structure and displacement transmission structur therefor | Examination procedure | 06.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3623677 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,6,11 * column 2, lines 5-18,42-65; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6273631 (TAKAHASHI KUNIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,11 * column 1, lines 13-19 * * column 3, lines 34-59 * * column 4, lines 41-45; figures 1a,1b,1c,3 *; | [XY]DE102005029904 (MURRPLASTIK SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 12 * paragraph [0021]; figures 3,4a,4b * [Y] 1-6,11; | [AD]EP1852588 (SMK SYSTEME METALL KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [AD] 1,6,11* paragraphs [0040] - [0042]; figure 1 * | Examination | JP2004012393 | by applicant | DE3623677 | US6273631 | DE102005029904 |