EP2199752 - Absolute position encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAGOR AUTOMATION S.COOP. Barrio San Andrés, s/n 20500 Arrasate - Mondragon / ES | [2020/16] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states FAGOR, S.COOP. Barrio San Andrés, s/n 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morlanes Calvo, Tomás C/ Julián Apraiz, 2 - 3º Centro 01011, Vitoria-Gasteiz / ES | 02 /
de la Fuente Prado, Pablo Avda. Jesús Galindez, 24 - 12º A 48004, Bilbao / ES | [2019/35] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Morlanes Calvo, Tomás C/ Julián Apraiz, 2 - 3º Centro 01011, Vitoria-Gasteiz / ES | ||
02 /
de la Fuente Prado, Pablo Avda. Jesús Galindez, 24 - 12º A 48004, Bilbao / ES | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael, et al Galbaian S. Coop. Garaia Parke Teknologikoa Goiru Kalea 1 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2019/35] |
Former [2012/28] | Igartua, Ismael, et al Galbaian S.Coop. Polo de Innovación Garaia Goiru Kalea 1 - P.O. Box 213 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón (Gipuzkoa) / ES | ||
Former [2010/25] | Igartua, Ismael Dpto. Propiedad Industrial B° San Andrés, s/n; Apdo 213 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | Application number, filing date | 08382078.7 | 17.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199752 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199752 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, G01D5/249, H03M1/28, H03M1/14, H03M1/30 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/2495 (EP);
G01D5/2455 (EP);
H03M1/143 (EP);
H03M1/282 (EP);
H03M1/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | G01D5/245, G01D5/249, H03M1/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES [2019/35] |
Former [2011/09] | DE, ES | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Absolutpositionsgeber | [2010/25] | English: | Absolute position encoder | [2010/25] | French: | Codeur de position absolue | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 24.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2019 | 07.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2185359 (ROSEMOUNT LTD) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US2003145479 (MAYER ELMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004005855 (MICROE SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 6 * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 27; figure 4a *; | [IY]US2004174161 (TAUSCH WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figure 3 * [Y] 6 | by applicant | US3162711 | US3187187 | GB2126444 | US4678908 | EP0453971 | ES2032719T | EP0503716 | DE4436784 | ES2199686 | EP1577646 |