EP2128631 - Faraday optical current sensor arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PowerSense A/S Skovlytoften 33 2840 Holte / DK | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
So̸rensen, Freddy Nobisvej 19 DK-3460 Birkero̸d / DK | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 08388018.7 | 30.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128631 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/24 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G01R15/245 (EP,US);
G01R1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/32] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Faraday-Stromsensoranordnung | [2009/49] | English: | Faraday optical current sensor arrangement | [2009/49] | French: | Agencement de capteur de courant optique Faraday | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4650971 (MANECCI JOHN V [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01305365 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 2,3,6 * abstract *; | [A]US5057769 (EDWARDS GERALD L [US]) [A] 7,8* abstract *; | [A]JPH04161860 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 2,3,6 * abstract *; | [X]JPH09257838 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 7-9 * abstract *; | [X]US2003146748 (DUNCAN PAUL GREMS [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] *; | [XD]WO2004099798 (KASMATIC INNOVATION AS [DK], et al) [XD] 7-9 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - line 18 * * page 15, line 27 - line 31 * * page 19, line 16 - line 20 * | by applicant | US7068025 |