EP1975312 - Method and apparatus in a paper or board machine for confining pulp flow from the headbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaahto OY Vanha Messiläntie 6 15860 Hollola / FI | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laari, Aki Ainolantie 16 45100 Kouvola / FI | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Laine, Terho Tapio, et al Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Ayritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Laine, Terho Tapio, et al Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08397506.0 | 27.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | FI20070005202 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: FI 20075202 | [2008/40] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975312 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/56 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
D21F1/56 (EP,FI,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung in einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine zur Eingrenzung des Faserstoffflusses aus dem Stoffauflauf | [2008/40] | English: | Method and apparatus in a paper or board machine for confining pulp flow from the headbox | [2008/40] | French: | Procédé et appareil dans une machine à carton ou papier pour confiner le débit de pâte dans la caisse d'arrivée | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/19] | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4968387 (BERAN ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 32; figure - * [Y] 4-7,14-26; | FI116796B [ ] (VAAHTO OY [FI]); | [Y]EP1681390 (VAAHTO OY [FI]) [Y] 4-7,14-26 * column W * | by applicant | US4968387 | FI115473B | FI116796B |