25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
16.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
24.07.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
15.08.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
08.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.08.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.05.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.02.2010 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
21.08.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |