EP2104193 - Rapid plug-in modular electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTICINO S.P.A. Viale Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | [2014/26] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Bticino S.p.A. Via Messina, 38 20154 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabrizi, Fabrizio Via Cucchi, 5 24122 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
Re, Marcello Via Buonarroti, 16 21040 Venegono Superiore, Varese / IT | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/42] | Mozzi, Matteo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/39] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425188.3 | 21.03.2008 | [2009/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104193 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104193 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/052, H01H71/08 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H01H71/08 (EP);
H01R9/2458 (EP);
H02B1/052 (EP);
H02B1/056 (EP);
H02B1/205 (EP);
H01H73/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | Schnellsteckvorrichtung für elektrische Module | [2009/39] | English: | Rapid plug-in modular electrical equipment | [2009/39] | French: | Branchement rapide pour un module électrique | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2008 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | IE | 21.03.2015 | LU | 21.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0472409 (CRABTREE ELECTRICAL IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 10 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0748018 (SQUARE D CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]WO0129856 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [A]EP1249909 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * figure - *; | [A]EP0798835 (BTICINO SPA [IT]) |