EP1994826 - An oven for baking foods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale A. Merloni 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Indesit Company S.P.A. Viale A. Merloni 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattogno, Gianluca Via G. Venezian, 54 62024 Matelica (Macerata) / IT | 02 /
Lacche', Tiziano Via R. Fidanza, 3 62024 Matelica (Macerata) / IT | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Paolizzi, Marco C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via A. Valentini, 11/15 47900 Rimini / IT | [2008/48] | Application number, filing date | 08425190.9 | 25.03.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | IT2007RN00028 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: IT RN20070028 | IT2007RN00055 | 07.11.2007 Original published format: IT RN20070055 | [2008/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994826 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A21B1/33, F24C3/12 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
A21B1/33 (EP);
F24C3/12 (EP);
F24C3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/31] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ofen zum Backen von Nahrungsmitteln | [2008/48] | English: | An oven for baking foods | [2008/48] | French: | Four pour cuire des aliments | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2314925 (WATERFORD FOUNDRY [IE]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-13,15-19,21,24,25,27-31,36-41 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9314350 (TEIXEIRA FILHO FABIO LOPES [BR]; ANDREONI MARCIO DI LORENZI [BR]) [X] 1-7,9,10,13,14,36-41 * page 2, lines 27-29; claims 13,19 * * page 16, lines 3-10 * * page 17, lines 16-24 *; | [X]US4930488 (PEARMAN A NOEL J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,9,10,24,25,36-41 * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 15; figure 1 * * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 33 *; | [X]EP0608147 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,24,25,36-41 * the whole document *; | [X]US6481433 (SCHJERVEN SR WILLIAM S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4-10,24,36-41 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0042] , [0061] - [0063]; figure 2.7b *; | [Y]US5111028 (LEE DUANE A [US]) [Y] 1-21,23-28,31-42 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2319833 (NEW WORLD [GB]) [Y] 1-21,23-28,31-42 * column 3, lines 48-66 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 6; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4310235 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 23 * column 2, lines 10-49 *; | [Y]US6690979 (SMITH ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 42 * claim 3 * |