EP2117085 - Interlocked electrical outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bocchiotti S.p.A. Societa' per l'Industria Elettrotecnica Via Vittor Pisani, 16 I-20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Bocchiotti S.p.A. Societa' per l'Industria Elettrotecnica Via Vittor Pisani, 16 20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nardi, Ivo Via S.M. della Costa, 46/1 16154 Genova / IT | 02 /
Cepolina, Francesco Via Garibaldi, 13/1 16030 Sori, Genova / IT | 03 /
Cometto, Manuel Via Lodovico Calda, 36/3 16153 Genova / IT | 04 /
Shahbazians, Vahan Via Montevideo, 10/12 16129 Genova / IT | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425313.7 | 08.05.2008 | [2009/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117085 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/707, H01R13/713, H01R13/74, H01R13/502 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
H01R13/707 (EP);
H01R13/713 (EP);
H01R13/74 (EP);
H01R13/502 (EP);
H01R13/516 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verriegelte Steckdose | [2009/46] | English: | Interlocked electrical outlet | [2009/46] | French: | Prise électrique asservie | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6106320 (GUNN DONALD JAMES [US]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 5, lines 19-48 * * column 7, lines 22-25 * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 9,10,18; | [Y]US5670763 (SPENCER CHARLES JEFFREY [US]) [Y] 9,10,18 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 11 * * figures 1-3,17,18 *; | [Y]GB1101637 (AMP INC) [Y] 9,10,18 * page 2, column R, lines 81-106 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE20204816U (ILME SPA [IT]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-5 * |