EP2143979 - Double-clutch gearchange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2011/51] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tornatore, Giovanni Via S. Martino, 5 10080 S. Benigno Canavese / IT | 02 /
Sola, Cesare Via Busano, 19 10087 Valperga / IT | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/02] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425335.0 | 13.05.2008 | [2010/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143979 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2143979 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/20 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
F16H61/28 (EP,US);
F16H2063/025 (EP,US);
F16H2063/208 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H63/20 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19284 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/37] |
Former [2010/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkupplunsgetriebeschaltung | [2011/35] | English: | Double-clutch gearchange | [2010/02] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesses pour boîte à double embrayages | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/02] | Doppelkupplungs-Getriebeschaltung | ||
Former [2010/02] | Changement de vitesse à double embrayage | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 14.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10108881 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2089271 (INT HARVESTER CO) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 13 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4115675 (BRATISLAVSKE AUTOMOBILOBE Z AK [CS]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]DE19920064 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4,7 *; | [A]WO2007065611 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07332490 (AISIN EE I KK) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2848629 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |