EP2169809 - A ferromagnetic wedge for closing slots of a rotating electric machine and a machine structure which incorporates the wedge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidec ASI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 336 20126 Milano (MI) / IT | [2013/45] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Ansaldo Sistemi Industriali S.p.A. Viale Sarca 336 20126 Milano MI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luise, Fabio Via Turcinella, 5 30174 Zelarino (VE) / IT | 02 /
Visintin, Massimiliano Via Tigor, 17 34100 Trieste / IT | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Bonvicini, Davide, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Bonvicini, Davide, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425640.3 | 30.09.2008 | [2010/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169809 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/493 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H02K3/493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Ferromagnetischer Keil zum Schliessen von Nuten einer elektrischen Drehmaschine und Maschinenstruktur mit dem Keil | [2010/13] | English: | A ferromagnetic wedge for closing slots of a rotating electric machine and a machine structure which incorporates the wedge | [2010/13] | French: | Cale ferromagnétique pour fermer les encoches d'une machine électrique rotative et structure de machine incorporant la cale | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4093881 (LIPTAK GABOR, et al) [A] 1-11* column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5911744 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9843340 (ALAMAEKI JARMO [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 2; claims 1,3 *; | [DA]US6683398 (TONG WEI [US], et al) [DA] 1-11 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 52; figures 1,9 * | Examination | CH521683 | JPS5849058 | by applicant | US2201699 | EP0052878 | US6683398 |