EP1990438 - Tool with coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BÖHLER Edelstahl GmbH & Co KG Mariazellerstraße 25 8605 Kapfenberg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Böhler Edelstahl GmbH & Co KG Mariazellerstraße 25 8605 Kapfenberg / AT | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Böhler Edelstahl GmbH & Co KG Mariazellerstrasse 25 8605 Kapfenberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caliskanoglu, Ziya Devrim Minoritenplatz 4 8600 Bruck/Mur / AT | 02 /
Mitterer, Christian Münzenbergstrasse 30A 8700 Leoben / AT | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/15] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / CH | ||
Former [2008/46] | Wildhack, Helmut Patentanwälte Wildhack - Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08450060.2 | 22.04.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | AT20070000707 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: AT 7072007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990438 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990438 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/10 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
C22C38/10 (EP,US);
C22C33/0285 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/52 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12049 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Werkzeug mit Beschichtung | [2008/46] | English: | Tool with coating | [2008/46] | French: | Outil doté d'un revêtement | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HR | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | MT | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | PT | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | NO | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2555679 (STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AB) [X] 1-12 * page 3, line 9 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP1052301 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0048] *; | [DA]WO0191962 (MACHNER & SAURER GMBH [AT], et al) [DA] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 4 ** claims 2-4 *; | [X] - 19000101, (19000101), XP009104271 [X] 1-12 * page 93, paragraph 4 * * page 94, paragraph 1 - page 96, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | DE2555679 | EP1052301 | WO0191962 |