EP2009299 - Anchor bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flowair, Glogowski i Brzezinski sp.j. Ul. Amona 84 81-601 Gdynia / PL | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glogowski, Maciej ul. Amona 84 81-601 Gdynia / PL | 02 /
Krzeszowski, Sebastian ul. Klonowa 14 83-300 Kartuzy / PL | 03 /
Szymanski, Pawel ul. Oginskiego 16/27 80-114 Gdansk / PL | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Czub, Krzysztof Kancelaria Prawa Wlasnosci Przemyslowej i Prawa Autoskiego Teresa Czub & Krzysztof Czub Rzecznicy Patentowi Spólka Partnerska PO Box 12 80-700 Gdansk 2 / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Czub, Krzysztof Kancelaria Prawa Wilasnosci Przemyslowej i Prawa Autoskiego Teresa Czub & Krzysztof Czub Rzecznicy Patentowi Spólka Partnerska PO Box 12 80-900 Gdansk 2 / PL | ||
Former [2009/01] | Czub, Krzysztof Kancelaria Prawa Wlasnosci Przemyslowej i Prawa Autorskiego PO Box 12 PL-80-900 Gdansk 2 / PL | Application number, filing date | 08460026.1 | 26.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | PL20070382763 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: PL 38276307 | [2009/01] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009299 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009299 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B33/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
F16B37/125 (EP,US);
F16B37/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/34] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ankerbolzen | [2009/01] | English: | Anchor bolt | [2009/01] | French: | Boulon d'ancrage | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2010 | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4067371 (STENCEL EDGAR L) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - line 36 * * column 3, line 48 - line 51; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]JPS4882359U (NN) [Y] 2 * figure - *; | [Y]US2003068210 (POUNTNEY DAVID GRENVILLE [NZ]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraph [0053]; figures 6b,14a *; | [X]US1967039 (OTTO MOHR) [X] 1 * page 1, line 61 - line 66; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP1767287 (NAGAYAMA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07174123 (RICOH KK) [A] 2-6 * abstract *; | [A]FR1308201 (KAYNAR MFG CO) [A] 3,4 * page 4, column l, paragraph 4 - column r, paragraph 2; figure - * |