Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012077801 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113197112 | 03.08.2011 | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | US97218208 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010204203 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52278208 | 10.01.2008 | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009124596 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | US97218208 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5369302B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B2 | JP2010515712 | 13.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008204412B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2012 | B2 | AU2008204412 | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2106396 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2014 | B1 | EP2106396 | 07.10.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0806689 | 21.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2674647 | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101636388B | 18.09.2013 | B | CN101636388 | 27.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009007231 | 14.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ602542 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ57780908 | 10.01.2008 | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2479584 | 20.04.2013 | C2 | RU2009123930 | 20.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA102670 | 12.08.2013 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | WO2008GB00061 | 10.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008084223 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A3 | WO2008084223 | 17.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090101303 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR064889 | 06.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2008000089 | 03.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102532135 | 04.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104147011 | 19.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6210698 | 20.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP099480 | 28.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY162022 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20090049 | 21.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20121529 | 16.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA08280783 | 24.04.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200836745 | 16.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY30863 | 02.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95204707 | 26.07.2007 | US94174907 | 04.06.2007 | US88445407 | 11.01.2007 |