EP2106396 - CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS 637: PYRIDOPYRIMIDINEDIONES AS PDE4 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Research, Ltd. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth, TX 76134-2099 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNERT, Roger, Victor AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 02 /
BURKAMP, Frank AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 03 /
COX, Rhona, Jane AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 04 /
DE SOUSA, Simon AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 05 /
DICKINSON, Mark AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 06 /
HUNT, Simon, Fraser AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 07 /
MEGHANI, Premji AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 08 /
PIMM, Austen AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 09 /
SANGANEE, Hitesh, Jayantilal AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | [2014/39] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
BONNERT, Roger, Victor AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | ||
02 /
BURKAMP, Frank AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
03 /
COX, Rhona, Jane AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
04 /
DE SOUSA, Simon AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
05 /
DICKINSON, Mark AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
06 /
HUNT, Simon, Fraser AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
07 /
MEGHANI, Premji AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
08 /
PIMM, Austen AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
09 /
SANGANEE, Hitesh, Jayantilal AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2013/50] | Teipel, Stephan Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08700158.2 | 10.01.2008 | [2009/41] | WO2008GB00061 | Priority number, date | US20070884454P | 11.01.2007 Original published format: US 884454 P | US20070941749P | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 941749 P | US20070952047P | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 952047 P | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008084223 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2106396 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2106396 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, C07D401/12, C07D471/04, C07D471/08, C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61P11/06 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D213/80 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Extension states | AL | 11.08.2009 | BA | 11.08.2009 | MK | 11.08.2009 | RS | 11.08.2009 | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE VERBINDUNGEN 637: PYRIDOPYRIMIDINDIONE ALS PDE4-INHIBITOREN | [2009/41] | English: | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS 637: PYRIDOPYRIMIDINEDIONES AS PDE4 INHIBITORS | [2009/41] | French: | COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES 637: PYRIDOPYRIMIDINEDIONES COMME INHIBITEURS PDE4 | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 21.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2008 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | GB | 10.01.2015 | IE | 10.01.2015 | LU | 10.01.2015 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
GB | 10.01.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
GB | 10.01.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
GB | 10.01.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
GB | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
GB | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2257203 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD) [X] 17 * Claim 1; examples 20, 23. *; | [X]US3838156 (BRUNDAGE R, et al) [X] 17 * Example 2. *; | [DA]WO9319068 (SYNTEX INC [US]) [DA] 1-17 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [X]WO2005086656 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 17* Claim 1; examples, e.g. nos. 1, 8-9, 17-18, 28-36. *; | [PX]WO2007004958 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1-17 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [PX]WO2007108750 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1-17 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [XA] - LOWE, J. A. ET AL., "Structure-Activity Relationship of Quinazolinedione Inhibitors of Calcium-Independent Phosphodiesterase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1991), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 624 - 628, XP003003222 [X] 17 * Page 624, scheme 1: compounds 1, 3, 4; page 626, right column, preparation of compound 1b. * [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00106a024 | [XA] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 388408 (BRN), XP002477479 [X] 17 * The whole document, e.g. reactions 2 of 4 and 3 of 4. * [A] 1-16 | [ ] - J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 2697 - 2706 | [A] - MARTIN, T. J., "PDE4 INHIBITORS - A REVIEW OF THE RECENT PATENT LITERATURE", IDRUGS, CURRENT DRUGS LTD, GB, (2001), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1369-7056, pages 312 - 338, XP008006266 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ODINGO, J. O., "Inhibitors of PDE4: A review of recent patent literature", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (2005), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 773 - 787, XP002413778 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.15.7.773 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 415896, 479775, 410392 (BRNs), XP002489032 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - FARMACO, EDIZIONE SCIENTIFICA, (1971), vol. 26, pages 844 - 845 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 417267, 484686 (BRNs), XP002489033 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - ACTA POLONIAE PHARMACEUTICA, (1967), vol. 24, pages 113 - 117 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 6423185, 6424485, 6396315, 6400301 (BRNs), XP002489034 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 2108 - 2121 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 619160 (BRN), XP002489035 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. MED. CHEM., (1967), vol. 10, pages 954 - 955 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 210425 (BRN), XP002489036 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1958), vol. 80, pages 421 - 425 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 4403671, 4407611 (BRNs), XP002489037 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 17, pages 235 - 240 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 513419 (BRN), XP002489038 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - HOPPE-SEYLER'S ZEITSCHR. PHYSIOL. CHEM., (1960), vol. 322, pages 164 - 172 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 609165, 610600 (BRNs), XP002489039 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC., (1961), page 4418 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 674620, 806392 (BRNs), XP002489040 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. MED. CHEM., (1976), vol. 19, pages 262 - 275 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 10462500 (BRN), XP002489041 [X] 17 * column A * | [ ] - J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, no. 10, pages 4021 - 4023 |