EP2150926 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SCHEDULING THE OPERATION OF BUILDING RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Gary, J. 2 Richardson Place North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 02 /
VONGTONGTIP, Stevun 2 Richardson Place North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 03 /
TICKELL, Sharon Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S - AB/2B P.O.Box 22445 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
FULLER, Gary, J. 2 Richardson Place North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | ||
02 /
VONGTONGTIP, Stevun 2 Richardson Place North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | |||
03 /
TICKELL, Sharon 2 Richardson Place North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2010/06] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08700395.0 | 30.01.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008AU00099 | Priority number, date | AU2007902715P | 21.05.2007 Original published format: AU 2007902715 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141356 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150926 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q50/00, G05B15/02 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/106 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25339 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | G06Q10/00, G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PLANUNG DES BETRIEBS VON GEBÄUDEBETRIEBSMITTELN | [2010/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SCHEDULING THE OPERATION OF BUILDING RESOURCES | [2010/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PLANIFICATION POUR LES RESSOURCES DE BÂTIMENT | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 29.08.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006080975 (OPENPEAK INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0009] - [0010] - [0025] , [0027] , [0033] - [0035] - [0041] , [0044] , [0046] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0055] - [0059] , [0063] - [0065] - [0068] , [0070] , [0073] , [0075] *; | [X]US2007055759 (MCCOY SEAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0011] , [0014] , [0033] - [0035] - [0037] - [0038] - [0047] , [0049] , [0053] , [0057] , [0058] , [0061] , [0065] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0073] , [0079] - [0080] - [0083] , [0084] *; | [A]US2007061020 (BOVEE JEFFREY K [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004]; figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] ** paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0034] , [0037] , [0040] * | International search | [X]US2005040247 (POUCHAK MICHAEL A [US]); | [X]US2005119765 (BERGMAN GABRIEL A [US], et al); | [X]AU2005201335 (AURA ASIA PACIFIC PTY LTD [AU]); | [XP]US2007217404 (KAWAMATA MOTOTSUGU [JP]); | [XP]WO2007137178 (EYEONHOME CORP [US], et al) | Examination | EP1085694 | by applicant | US2007055759 |