EP2119151 - METHODS FOR ESTABLISHING LEGITIMACY OF COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legitime Technologies Inc. 191 Post Road West Wesport, CT 06880 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN COEVERDEN DE GROOT, Mark F. 3519 Marlowe Avenue Montréal, Québec H4A 3L8 / CA | 02 /
SWAIN, John D. 46 Westland Avenue Apt. 44 Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08700494.1 | 08.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008CA00025 | Priority number, date | CA20072574439 | 08.01.2007 Original published format: CA 2574439 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008083473 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119151 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06F17/11, G06F17/30, H04L9/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L51/212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RECHTMÄSSIGKEIT VON ÜBERMITTLUNGEN | [2009/47] | English: | METHODS FOR ESTABLISHING LEGITIMACY OF COMMUNICATIONS | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR ÉTABLIR UNE LÉGITIMITÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/05] | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003009698 (LINDEMAN TERRENCE EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US6546416 (KIRSCH STEVEN T [US]); | [A]US2005188020 (AVRITCH PETER S [US], et al) |