EP2243002 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY DEPENDING ON MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hochschule Rapperswil HSR Oberseestrasse 10 8640 Rapperswil / CH | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHER, Benno Burgstrasse 99 CH-8706 Meilen / CH | 02 /
DOMBI, Adam Goethestrasse 11 CH-8712 Stäfa / CH | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Schalch, Rainer E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2010/43] | Application number, filing date | 08700532.8 | 28.01.2008 | [2010/43] | WO2008CH00027 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009094787 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243002 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01G9/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
G01G9/00 (EP);
G01V7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT, DIE VON MASSE ABHÄNGT | [2010/43] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY DEPENDING ON MASS | [2010/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER UNE PROPRIÉTÉ DÉPENDANT DE LA MASSE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 19.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1541978 (METTLER TOLEDO GMBH [CH] METTLER TOLEDO AG [CH]) [X] 1-8,10,20 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-5,10 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y]WO9840706 (GREGOR MANFRED ALEXANDER [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9815802 (GREGOR MANFRED ALEXANDER [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19927026 (GREGOR MANFRED A [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006005218 (POST AKADEMISCHES FORUM [CH]; MARX CHRISTOPH [CH]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * |