EP2117755 - METHOD FOR JOINING ALIGNED DISCRETE OPTICAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Pactech Packaging Technologies Gmbh Am Schlangenhorst 15-17 14641 Nauen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Pactech Packaging Technologies Gmbh Am Schlangenhorst 15-17 14641 Nauen / DE | |||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Pactech Packaging Technologies Gmbh Am Schlangenhorst 15-17 14641 Nauen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKERT, Erik Am Himmelsreich 9 99310 Arnstadt / DE | 02 /
BANSE, Henrik Thomas-Mann-Str. 40 07743 Jena / DE | 03 /
ZAKEL, Elke, Dr. Am Schlangenhorst 19 14641 Nauen / DE | 04 /
FETTKE, Matthias Probststrasse 9 10178 Berlin / DE | [2010/14] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
BECKERT, Erik Am Himmelsreich 9 99310 Arnstadt / DE | ||
02 /
BANSE, Henrik Thomas-Mann-Str. 40 07743 Jena / DE | |||
03 /
ZAKEL, Elke, Dr. Am Schlangenhorst 19 14641 Nauen / DE | |||
04 /
FETTKE, Matthias Bürgerheimstr. 4 10356 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2009/47] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08700854.6 | 08.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008DE00038 | Priority number, date | DE20071002436 | 09.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007002436 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008083676 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117755 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117755 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/005, B23K3/06, G02B7/00 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B23K1/0056 (EP,US);
B23K1/0008 (EP,US);
B23K3/0638 (EP,US);
G02B7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | B23K1/00, B23K1/012, B23K1/20, B23K3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÜGEN JUSTIERTER DISKRETER OPTISCHER ELEMENTE | [2009/47] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING ALIGNED DISCRETE OPTICAL ELEMENTS | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR JOINDRE DES ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES DISCRETS AJUSTÉS | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2017 | 14.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2008 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5478005 (NGUYEN HUNG N [US]) [A] 3-5,7,8 * column 2, line 42 - column 6, line 21; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE10240355 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004104460 (STARK DAVID H [US]) [X] 1,3-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0088] , [0097] - [0099] - [0232] , [0324]; figures 6,11 *; | [A]WO2005111687 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7* page 3, line 8 - line 19; claim 3 *; | [X] - GORSKI M ET AL, "Jet vapor deposition for Au/Sn solder applications", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (200302), Database accession no. 7660599, XP002477743 [X] 1-8,11-14 * abstract * | [ ] - Advanced Packaging PennWell Publishing USA, (200302), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1065-0555, pages 31 - 34, XP002477742 | Examination | US3648915 | US2006219760 | US2006237514 | by applicant | US5478005 | DE10240355 | US2004104460 | WO2005111687 | US2006219760 |