EP2106315 - APPARATUS FOR CUTTING OFF FIBRE MATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states LM GLASFIBER A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BØRSTING, Dennis, André Kikkenborgvej 43 DK-6000 Kolding / DK | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2019/51] |
Former [2013/42] | Hussey, Paul Anthony, et al LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
Former [2012/08] | Kitchen, Steven Richard, et al LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
Former [2009/41] | Kitchen, Steven Richard, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 08700886.8 | 16.01.2008 | [2009/41] | WO2008DK00014 | Priority number, date | DK20070000058 | 16.01.2007 Original published format: DK 200700058 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086802 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106315 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2106315 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/00, B24B19/22, B29C70/54 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/633 (EP,CN,US);
B23D45/003 (EP,CN,US);
B24B19/223 (EP,CN,US);
B29C70/545 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4561 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7493 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/51] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSCHNEIDEN VON FASERMATTEN | [2009/41] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CUTTING OFF FIBRE MATS | [2009/41] | French: | APPAREIL POUR COUPER DES TAPIS DE FIBRE | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2008 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | IE | 16.01.2020 | LU | 16.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | GB | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/22] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.01.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GB | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.01.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.01.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 16.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 16.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4954202 (PRICE DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10,12,13 * column 2, line 43 - line 45 * * column 2, line 58 - line 63 * * column 10, line 4 - line 14 * * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 60 * * column 12, line 11 - line 22; figure 11 * [Y] 2,3,5,11,14; | [Y]US3121253 (VARRIAL RALPH W) [Y] 2,3,11,14 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 15; figure 8 *; | [Y]FR2689436 (LINDER ETS [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, lines 3-10 * * page 7, line 3 - line 19; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US4989372 (AVILA STEVEN J [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 29 - line 32 * * column 4, line 50 - line 55; figure - *; | [Y]US5725723 (CUSICK GEORGE C [US], et al) [Y] 2,14 * column 3, line 6 - line 20; figure - *; | [A]DE4240933 (WEISSENBERGER AG REBSTEIN [CH]) [A] 2,14 * column 6, line 43 - line 60; figure - *; | [Y]US5046392 (KEON RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 2,14 * column 7, line 25 - line 30 * * column 9, line 55 - line 60 * * column 10, line 35 - line 42 *; | [DA]WO2006015598 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) | Examination | EP0324199 |