EP2120591 - NOVEL DRINKING YOGHURT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arla Foods Amba Sønderhøj 14 8260 Viby J / DK | [2010/30] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Arla Foods Amba Skanderborgvej 277 8260 Viby J / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Claus Mollevej 15 DK-7500 Holsterbro / DK | 02 /
CHRISTENSEN, Gunner Dardo Rocha 3234 Martinez B1640FTX Buenos Aires / AR | 03 /
BURLING, Hans Karl XI Gatan 17 B S-22 220 Lund / SE | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Claus Mollevej 15 DK-7500 Holsterbro / DK | ||
02 /
CHRISTENSEN, Gunner Dardo Rocha 3234 Martinez B1640FTX Buenos Aires / AR | |||
03 /
BURLING, Hans Karl XI Gatan 17 B S-22 220 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Münzer, Marc Eric Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2010/34] | Münzer, Marc Eric Guardian Intellectual Property Consulting I/S Krakasvej 17 3400 Hillerød / DK | ||
Former [2009/48] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 08700919.7 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008DK00048 | Priority number, date | US20070899034P | 02.02.2007 Original published format: US 899034 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008092458 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120591 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120591 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/13, A23C9/133, A23C21/06, A23C21/02, A23C21/08 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C21/026 (EP,US);
A23C21/06 (EP,US);
A23C21/08 (EP,US);
A23C9/133 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | A23C9/127, A23C9/133, A23C9/152, A23C9/156, A23C21/06, A23C21/02, A23C21/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/48] | A23C9/127, A23C9/133, A23C9/152, A23C9/156, A23C21/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | 01.09.2009 | BA | 01.09.2009 | MK | 01.09.2009 | RS | 01.09.2009 | Title | German: | NEUER TRINK-JOGHURT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/48] | English: | NOVEL DRINKING YOGHURT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2009/48] | French: | NOUVEAU YAOURT À BOIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 15.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE COMPAGNIE GERVAIS DANONE 17 Boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2013/32] | 07.08.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.04.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.06.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.09.2012 | LI | 26.09.2012 | CY | 01.02.2015 | HR | 01.02.2015 | LT | 01.02.2015 | LU | 01.02.2015 | LV | 01.02.2015 | MT | 01.02.2015 | SK | 01.02.2015 | SI | 02.02.2015 | EE | 28.02.2015 | MC | 02.03.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | GB | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | ES | 02.02.2017 | SE | 02.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | DK | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | [2022/30] |
Former [2020/33] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
MT | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
GB | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 02.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
DK | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
MT | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
GB | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
DK | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
GB | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
DK | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
DK | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 02.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CH | 26.09.2012 | |
LI | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2015 | ||
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
HR | 01.02.2015 | ||
LT | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
LV | 01.02.2015 | ||
SK | 01.02.2015 | ||
SI | 02.02.2015 | ||
EE | 28.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 01.02.2015 | |
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | LU | 01.02.2015 | |
MC | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | LU | 01.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1492981 (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 5 * examples 1,3 * [A] 1-4,6-18; | [XA]US4110476 (RHODES KENNETH H) [X] 5 * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 3; example - * [A] 1-4,6-18; | [XA]US4956185 (CAJIGAS STANLEY [US]) [X] 5 * example - * [A] 1-4,6-18; | [A]EP0642740 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18* column 3, line 24 - line 43 *; | [A] - KAILASAPATHY K ET AL, "EFFECT OF PARTIALLY REPLACING SKIM MILK POWDER WITH WHEY PROTEIN CONCENTRATE ON THE SENSORY QUALITIES OF LACTOSE HYDROLYSED ACIDOPHILUS YOGURT", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19980101), vol. 53, no. 7, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 385 - 389, XP000785246 [A] 1-18 * Section 3.4 on p. 420 * | International search | [A]GB1492981 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]US4110476 (RHODES KENNETH H); | [X]JPS5550885 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JPS5820180 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD); | [X]JPS60262584 (FUKUNAGA KAZUJI, et al); | [A]EP0184267 (HOLLAND MELKUNIE [NL]); | [A]EP0519127 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0639335 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al); | [X]WO9805221 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [X]US2005129825 (GRAY KIMBERLEY H [US], et al) | by applicant | GB1492981 | US4110476 | US4956185 | Opposition | - Tamine A.Y. et al, Yoghurt, Science and Technology. 2nd ed., Woodhead Publishing, (19990000), pages 11 - 35, XP055263999 | - Tamine A.Y. et al, Yoghurt, Science and Technology. 2nd ed., Woodhead Publishing, (19990000), pages 61 - 82, XP055264000 | - Tamine A.Y. et al, Yoghurt, Science and Technology. 2nd ed., Woodhead Publishing, (19990000), pages 306 - 309, XP055264001 | - Tamine A.Y. et al, Yoghurt, Science and Technology. 2nd ed., Woodhead Publishing, (19990000), pages 319 - 324, XP055264002 | - "Yo-Mix AR 01 Frozen direct inoculation culture", DANONE Product specification, (20120516), pages 1 - 10, XP055264004 | - "Product specification on YC-X11", CHR Hansen, (20020709), page 1, XP055264003 |