Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022403011 | ![]() | 22.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615066304 | 10.03.2016 | US202017072593 | 16.10.2020 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US202217569019 | 05.01.2022 | US201414322096 | 02.07.2014 | US201816154920 | 09.10.2018 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | US202117330606 | 26.05.2021 | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US202016807774 | 03.03.2020 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US201715791632 | 24.10.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019263896 | ![]() | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US201615066304 | 10.03.2016 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US201414322096 | 02.07.2014 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | US201816154920 | 09.10.2018 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | US201715791632 | 24.10.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019153082 | ![]() | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US201213717152 | 17.12.2012 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | US201715593845 | 12.05.2017 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US201816226409 | 19.12.2018 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9828420 | ![]() | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2016289310 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US201615066304 | 10.03.2016 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US201414322096 | 02.07.2014 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015147343 | ![]() | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US201414322096 | 02.07.2014 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013266586 | ![]() | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | US201313841485 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013266585 | ![]() | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US201313827673 | 14.03.2013 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013266514 | ![]() | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US201313838526 | 15.03.2013 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9670272 | ![]() | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2013216555 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US201213717152 | 17.12.2012 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8906367 | ![]() | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2010202968 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | US52203108 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8022268 | ![]() | 20.09.2011 | B2 | US2009117120 | 07.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US15766408 | 11.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10202445 | ![]() | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2017283491 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US201213717152 | 17.12.2012 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | US201715593845 | 12.05.2017 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10131708 | ![]() | 20.11.2018 | B2 | US2018134773 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US201615066304 | 10.03.2016 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | US52203110 | 01.03.2010 | US201414322096 | 02.07.2014 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | US201715791632 | 24.10.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090114388 | ![]() | 03.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | US52203108 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101735257B | ![]() | 12.05.2017 | B1 | KR20160102079 | 26.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101700073B | ![]() | 26.01.2017 | B1 | KR20160015402 | 12.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5398545B | ![]() | 29.01.2014 | B2 | JP2010514454 | 06.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL217923 | ![]() | 29.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3239175 | ![]() | 01.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | EP11184418 | 07.01.2008 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3239174 | ![]() | 01.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2436696 | ![]() | 13.12.2017 | B8 | EP2436696 | 07.06.2017 | B1 | EP2436696 | 04.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2426143 | ![]() | 28.06.2017 | B1 | EP2426143 | 13.06.2012 | A3 | EP2426143 | 07.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | EP11184418 | 07.01.2008 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2764852 | ![]() | 18.09.2018 | C | CA2764852 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | CA2674140 | 07.01.2008 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2674140 | ![]() | 15.05.2018 | C | CA2674140 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008203703C | ![]() | 03.04.2014 | C1 | AU2008203703B | 05.09.2013 | B2 | AU2008203703 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2099826 | ![]() | 16.10.2013 | B1 | EP2099826 | 16.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0806328 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0806328 | 14.07.2020 | B1 | BRPI0806328 | 06.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101622275B | 06.11.2013 | B | CN101622275 | 06.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103408661B | 06.04.2016 | B | CN103408661 | 27.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | CN200880006294 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114953T | 14.12.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119197T | 14.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2099826T | 20.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2426143T | 11.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2436696T | 04.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA017611 | 30.01.2013 | B1 | EA200900954 | 26.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2439490T | 23.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20140049T | 28.02.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20171190T | 20.10.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20171440T | 03.11.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | EP11184418 | 07.01.2008 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL199534 | 31.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009007136 | 24.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ600051 | 31.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | NZ57788308 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ708488 | 28.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | NZ61836008 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2099826T | 30.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2426143T | 29.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | EP11184418 | 07.01.2008 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2436696T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2099826T | 28.02.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP08700998 | 07.01.2008 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2436696T | 30.10.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP11185486 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200904700 | 28.11.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | WO2008EP00053 | 07.01.2008 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008081008 | ![]() | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120017469 | ![]() | 28.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017060463 | ![]() | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016116530 | ![]() | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5930502B | ![]() | 08.06.2016 | B2 | JP2015120744 | 02.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6006284B | ![]() | 12.10.2016 | B2 | JP2015110574 | 18.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5876014B | ![]() | 02.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013226162 | 07.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012139219 | ![]() | 26.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102603893 | 25.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6230998 | 20.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA029481 | 30.04.2018 | B1 | EA201201067 | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2635317T | 03.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2641897T | 14.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE033325T | 28.11.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE034512T | 28.02.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2436696T | 25.08.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2099826E | 09.01.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2426143T | 22.09.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2436696T | 21.08.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG177954 | 28.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07000211 | 05.01.2007 | US93429107 | 11.06.2007 | EP07020341 | 17.10.2007 | US87883107 | 05.01.2007 | Type | ![]() | EP2426143 | EP2436696 | EP3239174 | EP3239175 |