EP2126425 - CLOSURE DEVICE FOR A PRESSURE RESERVOIR OF A GAS-REFRIGERATION GENERATOR, WHICH CAN BE FILLED WITH A COMPRESSED GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBB International Group AG Bahnhofstrasse 9 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Mbb International Group AG Gersauerstrasse 78 6440 Brunnen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄGE, Martin Böhringer Strasse 11 74537 Bönnigheim / DE | 02 /
GRANTZ, Helmut Pfarrwiesenallee 31 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | 03 /
HELMS, Gunnar Perouser Strasse 66 71272 Renningen / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Maser, Jochen Patentanwälte Mammel und Maser Tilsiter Str. 3 71032 Sindelfingen / DE | [2009/49] | Application number, filing date | 08701032.8 | 09.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008EP00096 | Priority number, date | DE20071003321 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003321 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086963 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126425 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30, F16K31/06, F16K39/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B60R21/263 (EP,US);
F16K1/30 (KR);
F16K1/302 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (KR);
F16K31/0693 (EP,US);
F16K39/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MIT DRUCKGAS BEFÜLLBAREN DRUCKBEHÄLTER EINES KALTGASGENERATORS | [2009/49] | English: | CLOSURE DEVICE FOR A PRESSURE RESERVOIR OF A GAS-REFRIGERATION GENERATOR, WHICH CAN BE FILLED WITH A COMPRESSED GAS | [2009/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE POUR RÉCIPIENT SOUS PRESSION DE GÉNÉRATEUR DE GAZ BASSE TEMPÉRATURE, POUVANT ÊTRE REMPLI DE GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2010 | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5161776 (NICHOLSON ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,5,7-12,28 * column 2, line 33 - column 7, line 3; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US6068288 (KAROLEK NEIL C [US], et al) [DA] 1 * figures 1-30 *; | [A]US5472231 (FRANCE JOHN J [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE3942026 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * |