EP2124887 - -LACTAM-CONTAINING FORMULATIONS HAVING INCREASED STABILITY IN AQUEOUS SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Animal Health GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERTIN, Dirk Oskar-Erbslöh-Str. 7 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
BIGALKE, Bernd Plesser Str. 18 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
PIRRO, Franz Zur Schlenkhecke 5 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2009/49] | Application number, filing date | 08701052.6 | 10.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008EP00125 | Priority number, date | DE20071002924 | 19.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007002924 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008086971 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2124887 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K9/14, A61P31/00, A61K31/43, A61K31/545, C07D499/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A23K20/195 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/60 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A61K31/545 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | BETA-LACTAM-HALTIGE FORMULIERUNGEN MIT ERHÖHTER STABILITÄT IN WÄSSRIGER LÖSUNG | [2009/49] | English: | -LACTAM-CONTAINING FORMULATIONS HAVING INCREASED STABILITY IN AQUEOUS SOLUTION | [2009/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DU -LACTAME À STABILITÉ ACCRUE DANS UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 02.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4036968 (SHARLAND DAVID CEDRIC) [X] 1-4,16-19 * Ex. 17-19, in Verbindung mit Spalte 3, Zeilen 46-47, Ansprüche * [Y] 5-19; | [XY]US4248780 (BHARUCHA KEKHUSROO R, et al) [X] 1-4 * Anspruch 14 * [Y] 5-19; | [XY]EP0953569 (GIST BROCADES BV [NL]) [X] 1-4 [Y] 5-19; | [Y]WO9520946 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 10-19 * Ansprüche, Beispiele, Dissolution Tests Seite 13ff *; | [Y]EP1491195 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 10-19 * Beispiele,Ansprüche * |