EP2118048 - MALE CONTRACEPTIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amobi, Nnaemeka, Ikechukwu 12b Grittleton Road London W9 2DD / GB | For all designated states Smith, Ian Christopher 6 Hampstead Mansions Heath Street London NW3 6TS / GB | [2016/47] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Amobi, Nnaemeka, Ikechukwu 12b Grittleton Road London W9 2DD / GB | ||
For all designated states Smith, Christopher Ian 6 hampstead Mansions Heath Street London NW3 6TS / GB | |||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states KING'S COLLEGE LONDON An Institute Incorporated By Royal Charter, Strand London WC2R 2LS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
AMOBI, Nnaemeka, Ikechukwu Shepherd's House, Room 4.9 Guy'S, Kings & St. Thomas Centre for Applied Biome dical Sciences Research King'S College London, Guy'S Campus London Bridge, London SE1 1UL / GB | ||
02 /
SMITH, Christopher Shepherd's House, Room 4.9 Guy'S, Kings & St. Thomas Centre for Applied Biome dical Sciences Research King'S College London, Guy'S Campus London Bridge, London SE1 1UL / GB | Representative(s) | Swan, Elizabeth Mary Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Swan, Elizabeth Mary Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Swan, Elizabeth Mary Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08701841.2 | 17.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008GB00163 | Priority number, date | GB20070000893 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: GB 0700893 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008087421 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2118048 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118048 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/27, C07C211/55, C07C217/56, C07D207/06, C07D207/09, C07D211/04, C07D211/26, C07D211/48, C07D213/38, A61K31/40, A61P15/16 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
C07C211/27 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
C07C211/45 (EP,US);
C07C217/16 (EP,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D211/12 (EP,US);
C07D211/14 (EP,US);
C07D211/26 (EP,US);
C07D215/06 (EP,US);
C07D215/12 (EP,US);
C07D217/10 (EP,US);
C07D221/04 (EP,US);
C07D279/26 (EP,US);
C07D279/28 (EP,US);
C07D295/03 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EMPFÄNGNISVERHÜTENDES MITTEL FÜR MÄNNER | [2009/47] | English: | MALE CONTRACEPTIVE | [2009/47] | French: | CONTRACEPTIF MASCULIN | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 11.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2008 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | IE | 17.01.2017 | LU | 17.01.2017 | MT | 17.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.01.2008 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
MT | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.01.2008 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
MT | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.01.2008 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
MT | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
MT | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2769812 (WAYNE RUDDY ARLO); | [X]GB784892 (SANDOZ LTD); | [X]GB823733 (BEECHAM RES LAB); | [X]WO2005021523 (NEUROMED TECH INC [CA], et al); | [X]WO2005097779 (NEUROMED TECH INC [CA], et al); |