EP2167405 - DEVICE FOR THE STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL OF A STORED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vozrozhdenie Industrii Volokolamskoe shosse 1 office 606 a 125080 Moscow / RU | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HROMOV, Georgi 9-180 Kuusinena st. 123308 Moscow / RU | 02 /
KHOUDYAK, Oleg Kuusinena st. 9-212 123308 Moscow / RU | 03 /
NIKIFOROV, Boris 5/2-103 Sumskoj proezd 117308 Moscow / RU | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Weiss, Peter Dres. Weiss, Arat & Stern Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Weiss, Peter Dres. Weiss, Arat & Stern Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08702208.3 | 09.01.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008IB00044 | Priority number, date | RU20070125414 | 05.07.2007 Original published format: RU 2007125414 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004413 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167405 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167405 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B66F9/07 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
B65G1/0435 (EP);
B66F9/072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EIN- UND AUSLAGERN EINES LAGERGUTS | [2010/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL OF A STORED MATERIAL | [2010/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CHARGER ET DECHARGER UN PRODUIT EN STOCK | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2008 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | AT | 09.01.2013 | GB | 09.01.2013 | IE | 09.01.2013 | LU | 09.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
GB | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
GB | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
GB | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5839873 (LLOYD KURT M [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 8 - column 11, line 67 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US3662860 (BURCH ARTHUR R) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 62 * * figure 1 *; | [XIA]US3593823 (THOMPSON HARRY W) [X] 1,23,24 * column 11, line 36 - line 75; figure 22 * [I] 12,13,17 [A] 14-16,18-24; | [XA]DE1044712 (STEINBOCK GMBH) [X] 1,23,24 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 15 - line 30; figures 1-3 * [A] 12-22; | [XYA]US3954185 (WENTZ EDWARD A) [X] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 18; figures 2,6A * [Y] 12-22 [A] 23,24; | [Y]US2004216957 (HANSL RUDOLF [AT], et al) [Y] 12-22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] - [0009] - [0066] , [0078] , [0082] - [0086] * * figures 1-3,7,8 * | by applicant | RU2076841 | US3662860 | US3954185 | US3593823 | US2004216957 |