Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
06.09.2013 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
08.01.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.02.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.03.2010 | Change - extension states | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
06.02.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.10.2009 | Change - inventor | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
25.09.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
25.09.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
17.09.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.08.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.12.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.08.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.08.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.03.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |