EP2112705 - FILM-FILM REINFORCING MEMBER BONDED BODY, FILM-CATALYST LAYER BONDED BODY, FILM-ELECTRODE BONDED BODY, AND POLYELECTROLYTE TYPE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoi Muta Panasonic Corp J.P.R.O.C IP DC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Takeou OKANISHI Panasonic Corp J.P.R.O.C IP DC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Atsushi NOGI Panasonic Corp J.P.R.O.C IP DC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Yoichiro TSUJI Panasonic Corp J.P.R.O.C IP DC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703193.6 | 15.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008JP50329 | Priority number, date | JP20070011591 | 22.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007011591 | JP20070056057 | 06.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007056057 | [2009/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090778 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112705 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/0273 (US);
H01M8/0276 (EP);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0094 (EP,US);
H01M8/0284 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | GEBONDETER FILM-FILM-VERSTÄRKUNGSGLIEDKÖRPER, GEBONDETER FILM-KATALYSATORSCHICHT-KÖRPER, GEBONDETER FILM-ELEKTRODEN-KÖRPER UND BRENNSTOFFZELLE DES POLYELEKTROLYTTYPS | [2009/44] | English: | FILM-FILM REINFORCING MEMBER BONDED BODY, FILM-CATALYST LAYER BONDED BODY, FILM-ELECTRODE BONDED BODY, AND POLYELECTROLYTE TYPE FUEL CELL | [2009/44] | French: | CORPS LIÉ D'ÉLÉMENT DE RENFORCEMENT FILM-FILM, CORPS LIÉ DE COUCHE FILM-CATALYSEUR, CORPS LIÉ FILM-ÉLECTRODE, ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE DE TYPE POLYÉLECTROLYTE | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2009 | Translation filed | 16.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 16.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0521077 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3 *; | [AP]WO2007032422 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006046121 (SHIMOHIRA TETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005181267 (MITSUTA NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH08259710 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPS625569 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]WO2005086264 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006025335 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006338938 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JPH0521077 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [AP]WO2007032442 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006137203 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005081343 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [A]JP2003082488 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH10154521 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH07220742 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05242897 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0521077 |