EP2107491 - AUTHORITY MANAGEMENT METHOD, SYSTEM THEREFOR, AND SERVER AND INFORMATION EQUIPMENT TERMINAL USED IN THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Kaoru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703209.0 | 15.01.2008 | [2009/41] | WO2008JP50345 | Priority number, date | JP20070016561 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007016561 | [2009/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090779 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107491 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, H04B7/26, H04L9/08 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | G06F21/24, H04B7/26, H04L9/08, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | BERECHTIGUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, SYSTEM DAFÜR SOWIE IN DEM SYSTEM VERWENDETER SERVER UND INFORMATIONSENDGERÄT | [2009/41] | English: | AUTHORITY MANAGEMENT METHOD, SYSTEM THEREFOR, AND SERVER AND INFORMATION EQUIPMENT TERMINAL USED IN THE SYSTEM | [2009/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DROIT, SON SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF DE SERVEUR UTILISÉ DANS LE SYSTÈME, ET TERMINAL DE DISPOSITIF D'INFORMATIONS | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2009 | Translation filed | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 18.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004250074 (KILIAN-KEHR ROGER [DE]) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 6 *; | [A]WO2005057846 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-24* page 9, line 28 - page 13, line 4; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0946330 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2005165631 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2006121497 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2006173944 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003189360 | JP2004015507 | JP2004334756 | JP2005311781 | JP2006053749 | JP2007016561 |