EP2103683 - SUBSTRATE FOR CULTURE OF CARDIOVASCULAR TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gunze Limited 1, Zeze Aono-cho Ayabe-shi, Kyoto 623-8511 / JP | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOKA, Toshiharu 36-11 Miyasaka 3-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0051 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Goki 29-701 Daikyocho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0015 / JP | 03 /
IKADA, Yoshito 2-182 Hirookadani Gokasho Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | 04 /
MATSUDA, Shojiro c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | 05 /
SAKAMOTO, Yuki c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | 06 /
TAIRA, Tsuguyoshi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
SHINOKA, Toshiharu 36-11 Miyasaka 3-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0051 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMURA, Goki 29-701 Daikyocho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0015 / JP | |||
03 /
IKADA, Yoshito 2-182 Hirookadani Gokasho Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUDA, Shojiro c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | |||
05 /
SAKAMOTO, Yuki c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | |||
06 /
TAIRA, Tsuguyoshi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 1 Ishiburo Inokurashinmachi Ayabe-shi Kyoto 623-8512 / JP | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703459.1 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/39] | WO2008JP50609 | Priority number, date | JP20070009469 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007009469 | [2009/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008088042 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103683 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103683 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/34, A61L27/56, A61L27/58, C12N5/07 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
A61L27/3839 (EP,US);
A61L27/48 (EP,US);
A61L27/507 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
C12N2533/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/48, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/02] | A61L27/34, A61L27/56, A61L27/58 | ||
Former IPC [2009/39] | C12M3/00, A61L27/00, C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREM GEWEBE | [2009/39] | English: | SUBSTRATE FOR CULTURE OF CARDIOVASCULAR TISSUE | [2009/39] | French: | SUBSTRAT POUR LA CULTURE D'UN TISSU CARDIOVASCULAIRE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | Translation filed | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2008 | AT | 30.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | HR | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | IE | 18.01.2012 | LU | 18.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 29.02.2012 | NO | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LU | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0528039 (IGAKI KEIJI [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, paragraph 6 * * column 3, paragraph 5 - column 4, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,3,5,10 *; | [XY]EP1214952 (GUNZE KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0023] - [0025] - [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0041] * * claims 1-11 * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]WO2006051912 (IGAKI IRYO SEKKEI KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11* claims 1,13 *; | [XY]US2006153815 (SEYDA AGNIESZKA [US], et al) [X] 2-7,9-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0049] , [0050] , [0070] * * claims 1-17 * [Y] 8; | [XY] - MATSUMURA GOKI ET AL, "Evaluation of tissue-engineered vascular autografts", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (200611), vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 3075 - 3083, XP002559298 [X] 1,9-11 * abstract * * page 3076, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 3080, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 3079, column R, paragraph 2 * [Y] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2006.12.3075 | [XY] - ROH ET AL, "Construction of an autologous tissue-engineered venous conduit from bone marrow-derived vascular cells: optimization of cell harvest and seeding techniques", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC SURGERY, W. B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, US, (20070117), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3468, pages 198 - 202, XP005821098 [X] 1-4,9-11 * page 199, column L, paragraph 3 * [Y] 5-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpedsurg.2006.09.054 | [XY] - HIBINO N ET AL, "The tissue-engineered vascular graft using bone marrow without culture", JOURNAL OF THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, INC., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20050501), vol. 129, no. 5, ISSN 0022-5223, pages 1064 - 1070, XP004875241 [X] 1-4,9-11 * page 1065, column L, paragraph 2 * [Y] 5-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2004.10.030 | International search | [A]JP2001078750 (GUNZE KK, et al); | [A]JP2003019196 (GUNZE KK); | [A]JP2005168760 (GUNZE KK, et al); | [X]JP2005185529 (GUNZE KK, et al); | [X] - SHIN'OKA T. ET AL., "Midterm clinical result of tissue-engineered vascular autografts seeded with autologous bone marrow cells", J. THORAC. CARDIOVASC. SURG., (2005), vol. 129, no. 6, pages 1330 - 1338, XP022472370 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2004.12.047 | [A] - SHIN'OKA T., "7. Kekkan Saisei; Soshiki Kogaku-teki Saisei Gijutsu no Geno to Tenbo", JOURNAL OF JAPAN SURGICAL SOCIETY, (2004), vol. 105, no. 8, pages 459 - 463, XP008110145 | [A] - ICHIHARAY Y. ET AL., "Saisei Jinko Kekkan no Rinsho Oyo", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC SURGERY, (2004), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 1394 - 1400, XP001539174 | [A] - MATSUMURA G. ET AL., "Successful application of tissue engineered vascular autografts: clinical experience", BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, no. 13, pages 2303 - 2308, XP004420021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00043-7 | [A] - INOGUCHI H. ET AL., "Mechanical responses of a compliant electrospun poly (L-lactide-co-epsilon-caprolactone) small-diameter vascular graft", BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1470 - 1478, XP025097139 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.08.029 | by applicant | JP2001078750 | - ML. COOPER; L. F. HANSBROUGH; R. L. SPIELVOGEL ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1991), vol. 12, pages 243 - 248 | - C. A. VACANTI; R. LANGER ET AL., PLAST. RECONSTR. SURG, (1991), vol. 88, pages 753 - 759 |