EP2233897 - SOUND SOURCE IDENTIFYING AND MEASURING APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nittobo Acoustic Engineering Co., Ltd. 1-21-10 Midori Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0021 / JP | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Shinji c/o NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 1-21-10 Midori Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0021 / JP | 02 /
TADAHIRA, Yoshio c/o NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 1-21-10 Midori Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0021 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Koichi c/o NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 1-21-10 Midori Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0021 / JP | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Muenchstrasse 3 86482 Aystetten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Leienfelsstrasse 6 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703482.3 | 18.01.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008JP50632 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090754 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233897 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G01H3/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | SCHALLQUELLENIDENTIFIZIERUNGS- UND MESSVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2010/39] | English: | SOUND SOURCE IDENTIFYING AND MEASURING APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2010/39] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE MESURE D'UNE SOURCE SONORE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2010 | Translation filed | 09.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006038772 (NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001091351 (KOBAYASHI RIGAKU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JP2003329510 (NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO LTD); | [A]WO2004021031 (NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINERRING C [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS63308523 | JP3699705B | JPS6113169 | - "Koukuuki souon no jidousokutei genba ni okeru kufuu", INGENUITY ON SITE OF AUTOMATIC MEASUREMENT OF AIRCRAFT NOISE, (200510), vol. 29, no. 5 |