|
05.04.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
26 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
88 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
53 |