Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8404062 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2013 | B2 | US2010024505 | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008230641B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2012 | B2 | AU2008230641 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2116313 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B1 | EP2116313 | 17.04.2013 | A4 | EP2116313 | 11.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2679695 | 03.05.2011 | C | CA2679695 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101622083B | 08.08.2012 | B | CN101622083 | 06.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2116313T | 29.08.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | WO2008JP50666 | 15.01.2008 | EP08703516 | 15.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008117552 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100976758B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | B1 | KR20090101369 | 25.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4449991B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2010 | B2 | JP2008207200 | 11.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI329042B | 21.08.2010 | B | TW200902178 | 16.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007044868 | 26.02.2007 |