EP2112236 - ROTARY HEARTH REDUCING FURNACE AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMA, Shinji c/o NIPPON STEEL ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 46-59 Oaza-Nakabaru Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8585 / JP | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703649.7 | 22.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008JP50805 | Priority number, date | JP20070029502 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007029502 | [2009/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096592 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112236 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/10, C22B5/10, F27B9/16, F27B9/36, C21B13/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
F27B9/16 (EP);
C21B13/0073 (EP);
C21B13/105 (EP);
C22B5/10 (EP);
F27B9/36 (EP);
C22B1/216 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | C21B13/10, C22B5/10, F27B9/16, F27B9/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | DREHHERD-REDUKTIONSOFEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINEM BETRIEB | [2009/44] | English: | ROTARY HEARTH REDUCING FURNACE AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2009/44] | French: | FOUR DE RÉDUCTION À SOLE TOURNANTE ET SA MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2009 | Translation filed | 03.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1186675 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0055] * [I] 3; | [I]US6183246 (GOUEFFLEC GERARD LE [FR]) [I] 1-5 * column 1, lines 10-16 * * column 2, line 48 - line 62 * * column 3, line 20 - line 23 * * column 7, line 15 - line 20 *; | [A]US4480992 (OKAMOTO KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 5 * | International search | [Y]JP2005249354 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH11248359 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JP2004256868 (KOBE STEEL LTD) | by applicant | JPH11248359 |