EP2128543 - HEAT SOURCE UNIT AND REFRIGERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Satoshi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA, Shinya c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
OKA, Masahiro c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 04 /
MIZUTANI, Kazuhide c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704151.3 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP51384 | Priority number, date | JP20070020592 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007020592 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093718 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128543 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B40/04 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B40/04 (KR);
F25B45/00 (EP,US);
F25B49/02 (KR);
F25B2313/023 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02732 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B2400/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | WÄRMEQUELLENEINHEIT UND KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/49] | English: | HEAT SOURCE UNIT AND REFRIGERATION DEVICE | [2009/49] | French: | UNITÉ DE SOURCE DE CHALEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2009 | Translation filed | 13.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000146322 (ZEXEL CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 7-9; | [Y]US2003230106 (TAKANO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] *; | [YA]EP0339267 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * [A] 1; | [XA]JP2006153349 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 5-7; | [XA]US5140827 (REEDY WAYNE R [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5-7; | [XA]US2005097904 (LIFSON ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5-7 | International search | [X]JPH1047799 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2000292037 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [X]JPS59175961U ; | [X]JP2004061023 (CHIN KUMUSHU); | [Y]JP2006292214 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2004017681 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JPH0579357U ; | [A]JP2006214610 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2006078087 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2006214610 | JP2006078087 |