EP2236819 - VERTICAL AXIS WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noguchi, Tsuneo 3618-17, Hirano Yamanakakomura Minamitsuru-Gun Yamanashi 4010502 / JP | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704311.3 | 25.01.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008JP51602 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009093337 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236819 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F03D3/061 (EP);
G01M9/04 (EP);
F05B2240/214 (EP);
F05B2240/301 (EP);
F05B2260/83 (EP);
Y02E10/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | WINDMÜHLE MIT VERTIKALER ACHSE | [2010/40] | English: | VERTICAL AXIS WIND TURBINE | [2010/40] | French: | ÉOLIENNE À AXE VERTICAL | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | Translation filed | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1541865 (NOGUCHI TSUNEO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figures 1-3; claims 3,4 *; | [X]EP1422422 (SATSUKI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]JP2005307850 (NIKKEIKIN ALUMINIUM CORE TECH, et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE10328249 (REINHARD ROLAND [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]SU1733680 (SUMSK KH POLT I [SU]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]WO2005116446 (INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY BANK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004108330 (NOGUCHI TSUNEO); | [A]JP2004084522 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]DE3626917 (HERTER ERICH [DE], et al) |