EP2110426 - METALWORKING FLUID AND METALWORKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyodo Yushi Co., Ltd. 2-30, Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Koichi c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | 02 /
AIZAWA, Yuji c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | 03 /
MIMA, Satoshi c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
GOTO, Koichi c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
AIZAWA, Yuji c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
MIMA, Satoshi c/o KYODO YUSHI CO. LTD. 2-30 Tsujido Kandai 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704372.5 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008JP51670 | Priority number, date | JP20070022883 | 01.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007022883 | [2009/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093844 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110426 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110426 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/08, C10M133/50, C10M135/36, C23F11/12, C23F11/14, C23F11/16, C10N30/16, C10N40/20, C10N40/22 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
C10M173/00 (EP,US);
C10M133/50 (KR);
C10M133/36 (KR);
C10M141/08 (EP,US);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M2203/065 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/401 (EP,US);
C10M2207/402 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2215/222 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2219/09 (EP,US);
C10M2219/104 (EP,US);
C10N2030/16 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/20 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/22 (EP,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,US);
Y10T83/283 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/126, C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104, C10M2209/108 (US,EP);
C10M2219/044, C10N2010/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | METALLBEARBEITUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT UND METALLBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/43] | English: | METALWORKING FLUID AND METALWORKING METHOD | [2009/43] | French: | FLUIDE POUR TRANSFORMATION DES MÉTAUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION DES MÉTAUX | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2009 | Translation filed | 03.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 16.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2014
23.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Rhenus Lub GmbH & Co. KG Erkelenzer Strasse 36 41179 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2014
23.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Rhenus Lub GmbH & Co. KG Erkelenzer Strasse 36 41179 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 29.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.08.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IE | 01.02.2014 | LU | 01.02.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | DE | 02.09.2014 | GB | 01.02.2015 | PL | 01.02.2015 | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/38] | HU | 01.02.2008 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
PL | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 01.02.2008 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
PL | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
PL | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
PL | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
DE | 02.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004238338 ; | [XY]US4295887 (BUCKLEY ALAN J, et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 19; examples 1,2 * * column 1, line 25 - line 39 * [Y] 3,4; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 59, Database accession no. 2004-608285, XP002630233 & JP2004238338 A 20040826 (PERMACHEM ASIA LTD) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * [Y] 3 | [YA] - Michael and Irene Ash, Handbook of Preservatives, USA, Synapse Information Resources Inc., (2004), ISBN 1-890595-66-7, XP002630234 [Y] 3,4 * pages 76,304 * * page 838 * [A] 1,2,5-9 | [Y] - Clariant, "Nipacide MBM Technical Data", (20010924), URL: http://www.clariant.com/C125691A003596E5/lookupDownloads/MBM+TDS.pdf/$FILE/MBM+TDS.pdf, (20110428), XP002630235 [Y] 3 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS464199B ; | [Y]US3929563 (SHEMA BERNARD F, et al); | [X]US4105431 (LEWIS SHELDON N, et al); | [X]JPH0559360 (ROHM & HAAS); | [X]JPH11506103 ; | [Y]JP2003535188 ; | [X]JP2004238338 (PERMACHEM ASIA LTD); | [X] - WILLINGHAM G.L. AND DERBYSHIRE R.L., "Compatibility and Stabilization of Methylchloro/Methyl-Isothiazolone in Metalworking Fluids", LUBRICATION ENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 47, no. 9, pages 729 - 732, XP008111291 | [Y] - BENNETT E.O., ONYEKWELU I.U, GANNON J.E., "Corrosion inhibitors as preservatives for metal working fluids. 2. Morpholine compounds", MATERIALS PERFORMANCE, (1979), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 40 - 45, XP008111018 | by applicant | JPH0631388B | JPH0676590B | JPH0730348B | JPH0737632B | JP2510233B | JP2645675B | JP2676056B | JPH09316482 | JPH10298012 |