EP2119738 - POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd. 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONOKE, Satoru 28-8 Inarimae Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Toshihiro Room 501 Ruvio II 21-3 Sakura 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0003 / JP | [2014/16] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
SONOKE, Satoru 28-8 Inarimae Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
UEDA, Toshihiro Room 501 Ruvio II 21-3 Sakura 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704396.4 | 04.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP51719 | Priority number, date | JP20070024992 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007024992 | JP20070176827 | 05.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007176827 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096690 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119738 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119738 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/333, A61K9/127, A61K31/7088, A61K31/7105, A61K31/711, A61K31/713, A61K47/16, A61K47/24, A61K47/34, A61K48/00, A61P3/00, A61P25/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/12, A61P35/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C08G65/3322 (EP,US);
C08G65/33306 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENGLYKOLDERIVAT | [2009/47] | English: | POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL DERIVATIVE | [2009/47] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2009 | Translation filed | 31.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to non-payment of the late furnishing fee for the sequence listing | 19.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2008 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004078121 (ALZA COPORATION [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005000360 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2005026372 (PROTIVA BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2006022325 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]US2006211642 (MCSWIGGEN JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 140 *; | [YP]EP1783137 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [YP] 1-13 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]WO9748712 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000281569 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD); | [A]JP2003505401 ; | [A]WO2005030835 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007505954 | by applicant | WO9419314 | WO9920283 | WO9948531 | - KAZUKO HIRABAYASHI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 59, pages 4325 - 4333 | - KAZUKO HIRABAYASHI ET AL., ONCOLOGY RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 11, pages 497 - 504 | - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1970), vol. 35, pages 2082 - 2083 | - NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, pages 4539 - 4557 | - JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2001), vol. 70, pages 295 - 307 | - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2004), vol. 314, pages 283 - 291 |