EP2205909 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/20] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Sai-Kee 308-706 Hyangchon Lotte Apt.899 Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-070 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Pil-Hyun 721-1408 Mokdong 7danji Apt. Mok 1-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-051 / KR | [2017/20] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
OH, Sai-Kee 308-706 Hyangchon Lotte Apt.899 Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-070 / KR | ||
02 /
YOON, Pil-Hyun 721-1408 Mokdong 7danji Apt. Mok 1-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-051 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/28] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08704926.8 | 23.01.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008KR00417 | Priority number, date | KR20070107561 | 25.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070107561 | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009054570 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205909 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2205909 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
F25B31/004 (EP,US);
F25B43/00 (KR);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B43/02 (EP,US);
F25B2341/0016 (EP,US);
F25B2400/04 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2010/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2010/28] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2010/28] | French: | CLIMATISEUR | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 26.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2008 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | GB | 23.01.2018 | IE | 23.01.2018 | LU | 23.01.2018 | MT | 23.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
MT | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
MT | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
MT | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
GB | 23.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2002327975 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 11-15 [I] 3-10; | [Y]EP0715133 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-15 * abstract *; | [X]JP2007009922 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5236311 (LINDSTROM ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR20060039344 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20060055830 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20020053451 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | Examination | US3548612 | JPS5318042 | by applicant | JP2002327975 | US3548612 | JPS5318042 |