EP2120915 - POLYELECTROLYTE PRECIPITATION AND PURIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHRNER, Robert, L. 3816 Pasadena Drive San Mateo, California 94403 / US | 02 /
FRANKLIN, Jayme 1715 Marina Court, Apt. E San Mateo, California 94403 / US | 03 /
MCDONALD, Paul, J. 534 Valley St. San Francisco, California 94131 / US | 04 /
PERAM, Thanmaya 174 Lu Anne Drive Campbell, California 95008 / US | 05 /
SISODIYA, Vikram 849 DiFiore Drive, No. 1 San José, California 95128 / US | 06 /
VICTA, Corazon 50 Iron Horse Lane Walnut Creek, California 94597 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | van der Hoff, Hilary Mary, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | King, Hilary Mary, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08705841.8 | 10.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US50747 | Priority number, date | US20070886068P | 22.01.2007 Original published format: US 886068 P | US20070013446 | 13.12.2007 Original published format: US 13446 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008091740 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120915 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120915 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, C07K1/30, C07K1/36, C07K16/00, C07K16/28 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (KR);
C07K1/32 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | 10.08.2009 | BA | 10.08.2009 | MK | 10.08.2009 | RS | 10.08.2009 | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNG VON POLYELEKTROLYTEN UND REINIGUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN | [2009/48] | English: | POLYELECTROLYTE PRECIPITATION AND PURIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES | [2009/48] | French: | PRÉCIPITATION DE POLYÉLECTROLYTE ET PURIFICATION DE PROTÉINES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11173495.0 / EP2377527 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2008 | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HR | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | NO | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | IE | 10.01.2012 | LU | 10.01.2012 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
LU | 10.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3737377 (STERNBERG M) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0162034 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 14, lines 1-26 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 9 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 14 * * claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO9314110 (MIDDLESEX SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5641870 (RINDERKNECHT ERNST H [US], et al) [X] 24 * page 17, column L, lines 39-48 * [A] 1-23,25-38; | [A]WO0000038 (MICHAEL FOODS INC [US]) [A] 24-38 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1275437 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004121339 (ZHOU JIZHONG [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 2, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 6, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 *; | [XA]WO2004092393 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 24 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 26 * [A] 1-23,25-38; | [A]WO2005051359 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 27, paragraph 1 * * page 30, paragraph 3 - page 31, paragraph 1 * * page 36 * * page 49 - page 50 *; | [A] - KERSCHER L ET AL, "Precipitation methods for the determination of LDL-cholesterol.", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY APR 1985, (198504), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9120, pages 118 - 125, XP002475905 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9120(85)80093-X | [A] - SHALOVA IRINA N ET AL, "Interaction of polyanions with basic proteins, 2(a) : influence of complexing polyanions on the thermo-aggregation of oligomeric enzymes.", MACROMOLECULAR BIOSCIENCE 15 DEC 2005, (20051215), vol. 5, no. 12, ISSN 1616-5187, pages 1184 - 1192, XP002493855 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mabi.200500142 | [A] - MUSTAFAEV M., "Functionally Biopolymer Systems", SIGMA, JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING AND NATURAL SCIENCES, ISTANBUL, (2004), vol. 4, pages 1 - 28, XP002493856 [A] 1-23 * page 2 - page 4 * * figures 10,16,17 * | [A] - BERDICK M ET AL, "The interaction of catalase with synthetic polyelectrolytes.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY FEB 1954, (195402), vol. 206, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 959 - 971, XP002493857 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - BOZZANO A G ET AL, "SEPARATION OF PROTEINS FROM POLYELECTROLYTES BY ULTRAFILTRATION", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19910101), vol. 55, no. 1 / 02, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 181 - 198, XP000175418 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(00)82334-0 | [A] - FISHER R R ET AL, "Polyelectrolyte precipitation of proteins: I. The effect of reactor conditions.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 5 SEP 1988, (19880905), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 777 - 785, XP002493858 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260320609 | [XA] - RISKE ET AL, "The use of chitosan as a flocculant in mammalian cell culture dramatically improves clarification throughput without adversely impacting monoclonal antibody recovery", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 128, no. 4, ISSN 0168-1656, (20070113), pages 813 - 823, (20080828), XP005916242 [X] 24,25,28,31,34-38 * page 814, column R, paragraph 3 - page 815, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 816, column R, paragraph 2 - page 817, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 820, column R, paragraph 1; table 2 * * page 822, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * [A] 26,27,29,30,32,33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2006.12.023 | [A] - MOERBE J L ET AL, "Release of miniantibodies from E. coli cells into the supernatant at low and high cell densities", MICROBIOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (199712), vol. 152, no. 4, ISSN 0944-5013, pages 385 - 394, XP008095547 [A] 24-38 * the whole document * | [A] - AUNINS J G ET AL, "INDUCED FLOCCULATION OF ANIMAL CELLS IN SUSPENSION CULTURE", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1989), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 629 - 638, XP002493859 [A] 24-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260340507 | [A] - ALDINGTON ET AL, "Scale-up of monoclonal antibody purification processes", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070116), vol. 848, no. 1, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 64 - 78, XP005922828 [A] 24-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2006.11.032 | [A] - SCOPES ET AL, "Protein Purification - Principles and Practice", PROTEIN PURIFICATION. PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE, NEW YORK, SPRINGER VERLAG, US, (19870101), pages 21 - 71, XP002109597 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * | [A] - "PLASMA MEMBRANE: RAPID ISOLATION AND EXPOSURE OF The CYTOPLASMIC SURFACE BY USE OF POSITIVELY CHARGED BEADS", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19770121), vol. 195, no. 4275, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 302 - 304, XP009016723 [A] 24-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.831278 | by applicant | US5641870 | WO2004092393 | - WANG ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1996), vol. 12, pages 356 - 362 | - VEIS, A., AM. CHEM. SOC. DIV. POLYM. CHEM. PREPR., (1991), vol. 32, no. 1, page 596 | - DAINIAK ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 277, pages 58 - 66 | - DUBIN ET AL., SEP. PURIF. METHODS, (1994), vol. 23, pages 1 - 16 | - COOPER ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN COLLOID & INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 10, pages 52 - 78 | - MATTISON ET AL., MACROMOL. SYMP., (1999), vol. 140, pages 53 - 76 | - CARLSSON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 3140 - 3149 | - RISKE ET AL., J BIOTECH., (2007), vol. 128, pages 813 - 823 |