EP2121528 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REMOVING MANGANESE FROM WASTE LIQUORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vale Inco Limited 200 Bay Street Royal Bank Plaza Suite 1600 South Tower P.O. Box 70 Toronto, Ontario M5J 2K2 / CA | [2016/37] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Vale Inco Limited Park 80 West Plaza Two Saddle Brook NJ 07663 / US | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Vale Inco Limited Park 80 West Plaza Two Saddle Brook NJ 07663 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUARZAIGA, Mohamed 2719 Spruce Needle Court Mississauga, Ontario L5L 1N2 / CA | 02 /
DEVUYST, Eric 232 Glover Road Stoney Creek, Ontario L8E 5H7 / CA | 03 /
EDWARDS, Julian 4336 Concession 11 , R.R. 1 Moffat, Ontario L0P 1J0 / CA | 04 /
PAVENTI, Joe 1197 Fox Crescent Multon, Ontario L9T 6C5 / CA | 05 /
DUTERQUE, Jean-Paul, Raymond 2, impasse Corail Tina golf Noumea, 98800 / NC | 06 /
PERRAUD, Jean-Jacques, Robert 45, route de la cornice Vallon-Dore Mont-Dore, 98809 / NC | [2016/01] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
BUARZAIGA, Mohamed 2719 Spruce Needle Court Mississauga, Ontario L5L 1N2 / CA | ||
02 /
DEVUYST, Eric 232 Glover Road Stoney Creek, Ontario L8E 5H7 / CA | |||
03 /
EDWARDS, Julian 4336 Concession 11 , R.R. 1 Moffat, Ontario L0P 1J0 / CA | |||
04 /
PAVENTI, Joe 1197 Fox Crescent Multon, Ontario L9T 6C5 / CA | |||
05 /
DUTERQUE, Jean-Paul, Raymond 2, impasse Corail Tina golf Noumea, 98800 / NC | |||
06 /
PERRAUD, Jean-Jacques, Robert 45, route de la cornice Vallon-Dore Mont-Dore, 98809 / NC | Representative(s) | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08706288.1 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008CA00141 | Priority number, date | US20070679917 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: US 679917 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008104048 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121528 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121528 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/04, C02F1/52, C02F1/58, C02F1/66, C02F1/72 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C01G45/02 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/5245 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (EP,US);
C02F1/74 (EP,US);
C02F2103/10 (EP,US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.09.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON MANGAN AUS ABLAUGEN | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REMOVING MANGANESE FROM WASTE LIQUORS | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ENLEVER LE MANGANÈSE DE LIQUIDES RÉSIDUAIRES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 06.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2008 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | DE | 02.08.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.01.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 02.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0001680 (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9,11,12 * page 2, line 1 - page 7, line 26; claims 1-3,5-10 *; | [A]US5266210 (MCLAUGHLIN RONALD J [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7,14 * column 1, line 8 - line 10 * * column 2, line 38 - line 50; figure 2; claims 1,8; tables II,III ** abstract *; | [A]US2003132166 (REY PAUL [US]) [A] 1-3,10,13,16 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [A]US2004094484 (ZHUANG J MING [CA]) [A] 1,2,4,7,9,13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; table 2 *; | [A]WO2004103918 (WATER MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,14 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 2 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 11; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2311314 (REICHERT JOSEPH S, et al); | [A]US4465597 (HERMAN STEWART T [US], et al); | [A]WO0056943 (LAKEFIELD RESEARCH LIMITED [CA], et al); | [A]US6245240 (NOBLE BRIAN CAMERON [GB]) |