EP2117524 - USE OF CATECHOLAMINES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS ANTI-ANGIOGENIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, ON K1A 0R6 / CA | [2019/33] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, ON K1A OR6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONISHI, Yasuo 21 Chaudiere St. Kirkland, Quebec H9H 4C8 / CA | 02 /
MAGOON, Joanne 1983 Richardson Montréal, Québec H3K 1G8 / CA | 03 /
JARUSSOPHON, Suwatchai 84 moo 5 Banglaung Muang, Pathumthani 12000 / TH | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Straße 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08706338.4 | 29.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008CA00191 | Priority number, date | US200789781407P | 29.01.2007 Original published format: US 89781407 P | US200792467407P | 25.05.2007 Original published format: US 92467407 P | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/31] | US20070897814P | 29.01.2007 | |
US200792467407P | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/47] | US20070897814P | 29.01.2007 | |
US20070924574P | 25.05.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008092257 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117524 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117524 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2117524 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K31/222, A61K31/36, A61P9/00, A61K9/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (US);
A61K31/222 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (US);
A61K31/495 (US);
A61K31/522 (US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | A61K31/137, A61K31/216, A61K31/222, A61K31/36, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/522, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CATECHOLAMINEN UND ENTSPRECHENDEN VERBINDUNGEN ALS MITTEL GEGEN ANGIOGENESE | [2009/47] | English: | USE OF CATECHOLAMINES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS ANTI-ANGIOGENIC AGENTS | [2009/47] | French: | UTILISATION DE CATECHOLAMINES ET DE COMPOSES ASSOCIES COMME AGENTS ANTI-ANGIOGENIQUES | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.07.2019 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2008 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | LU | 29.01.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH09136830 (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN) [I] 1-6,10-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO03032969 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,10-16 * page 2, lines 15-24 * * claims 1-17, 58-76 *; | [XPL]WO2007109882 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [XP] 1-6,10-14,16 * claims 14-30 * * priority not valid * [L] 1-6,10-14,16; | [I]WO2006015830 (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE], et al) [I] 1-6,10-14,16 * claims 14, 17-18, 20 *; | [X]WO9606081 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-13 * claims 22-23 * * page 8, lines 6, 11 * * page 55; example 27 *; | [XI]US5395970 (TUTTLE RONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * column 2, lines 30-32 * * claims 1-2 * * example 1 * [I] 15; | [Y]US2004038972 (DEN HARTOG JACOBUS A J [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6,10-16 * claims 11, 14 * * page 3, paragraph 32 * * page 7, paragraph 69 *; | [I] - "Isoproterenol-containing retina protectant - is useful for treating diseases causing injury to retinal cells e.g. diabetes mellitus, etc", DERWENT, (1997), XP002228062 [I] 1-6,10-16 * abstract * | [I] - JOHNSON K ET AL, "METABOLISM, PHARMACOKINETICS, AND EXCRETION OF A HIGHLY SELECTIVE N-METHYL-D-ASPARTATE RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST, TRAXOPRODIL, IN HUMAN CYTOCHROME P450 2D6 EXTENSIVE AND POOR METABOLIZERS", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20030101), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1124/DMD.31.1.76, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 76 - 87, XP009069857 [I] 1-6,11,12 * page 77; figure 1; examples Trapoxadil, M13 * * page 76, column right, lines 5-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.31.1.76 | [Y] - COMAI K ET AL, "PHENETHYLAMINE INHIBITORS OF PARTIALLY PURIFIED RAT AND HUMAN PANCREATIC LIPASE", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1982), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 418 - 421, XP007920652 [Y] 1-6,10-16 * page 420; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600710411 | [A] - PANDYA N M ET AL, "Angiogenesis-a new target for future therapy", VASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 44, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.VPH.2006.01.005, ISSN 1537-1891, (20060501), pages 265 - 274, (20060501), XP024970442 [A] 1-6,10-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vph.2006.01.005 | [T] - Rhodia, "GPS Safety Summary Para trifluoromethylaniline", (20111201), URL: http://www.rhodia.com/en/binaries/GPS_2011_12_v1_Paratrifluoromethylaniline_gb1.pdf, (20120524), XP007920651 [T] 15 * page 2/6 * | [YD] - THAKER PREMAL H ET AL, "Chronic stress promotes tumor growth and angiogenesis in a mouse model of ovarian carcinoma", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 12, no. 8, doi:10.1038/NM1447, ISSN 1078-8956, (20060801), pages 939 - 944, (20060723), XP002590206 [YD] 1-6,10-16 * last full sentence; page 940, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1447 | [I] - NAGARAJAN R ET AL, "A novel catecholamine, arbutamine, for a pharmacological cardiac stress agent", CARDIOVASCULAR DRUGS AND THERAPY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, (19960101), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 0920-3206, pages 31 - 38, XP009159647 [I] 1-6,10-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00051128 | International search | [AP]WO2007109882 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al); | [A]WO03032969 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al); | [A]WO2006015830 (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE], et al); | [A]US2003181354 (ABDULRAZIK MUHAMMAD [IL]); | [A] - CHALOTHORN D. ET AL., "Catecholamines augment collateral vessel growth and angiogenesis in hindlimb ischemia", AM. J. PHYSIOL. HEART CIRC. PHYSIOL., (2005), vol. 289, pages H947 - H959, XP008109101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpheart.00952.2004 | Examination | US2007021512 | by applicant | - BASU, S.; NAGY, J. A.; PAL, S.; VASILE, E.; ECKELHOEFER, I. A.; BLISS, V. S.; MANSEAU, E. J.; DASGUPTA, P. S.; DVORAK, H. F.; MUKH, "The neurotransmitter dopamine inhibits angiogenesis induced by vascular permeability factor/vascular endothelial growth factor", NAT. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 569 - 574 | - BENTLEY, G. A.; STARR, J, "The antinociceptive action of some ?-adrenoceptor agonists in mice", BR. J. PHARMACOL, (1986), vol. 88, pages 515 - 521 | - BOULTON, D. W.; FAWCETT, J. P, "p2-Agonist eutomers: A rational option for the treatment of asthma?", AM. J. RESPIR. MED., (2002), vol. 1, pages 305 - 311 | - CHEN, A. S.; TAGUCHI, T.; SUGIURA, M.; WAKASUGI, Y.; KAMEI, A.; WANG, M. W.; MIWA, I, "Pyridoxal-aminoguanidine adduct is more effective than aminoguanidine in preventing neuropathy and cataract in diabetic rats", HORM. METAB. RES., (2004), vol. 36, pages 183 - 187 | - CONWAY, W. D.; MINATORYA, H.; LNDS, A. M.; SHEKOSKY, J. M, "Absorption and elimination profile of isoproterenol III. The metabolic fate of dl-isoproterenol-7-3H in the dog", J. PHARM. SCI., (1968), vol. 57, pages 1135 - 1141 | - CHALOTHORN, D.; ZHANG, H.; CLAYTON, J.A.; THOMAS, S.A.; FABER, J.E, "Catecholamines augment collateral vessel growth and angiogenesis in hindlimb ischemia", AM. J. PHYSIOL. HEART CIRC. PHYSIOL., (2005), vol. 289, pages H947 - H959 | - DEJGAARD, A.; HILSTED, J.; CHRISTENSEN, N.J, "Noradrenaline and isoproterenol kinetics in diabetic patients with and without autonomic neuropathy", DIABETOLOGIA, (1986), vol. 29, pages 773 - 777 | - JARVINEN, T.; JARVINEN, K, "Prodrugs for improved ocular drug delivery", ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1996), vol. 19, pages 203 - 224 |