EP2062461 - CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAHNER, Thomas Reginastrasse 11 92665 Altenstadt / DE | 02 /
DAMS, Florian Münchshofener Strasse 42 93158 Teublitz / DE | 03 /
HOLZER, Peter Siedlerstrasse 26 93083 Obertraubling / DE | 04 /
GRÖTSCH, Stefan Waldstrasse 6 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
ZAHNER, Thomas Reginastrasse 11 92665 Altenstadt / DE | ||
02 /
DAMS, Florian Münchshofener Strasse 42 93158 Teublitz / DE | |||
03 /
HOLZER, Peter Siedlerstrasse 26 93083 Obertraubling / DE | |||
04 /
GRÖTSCH, Stefan Waldstrasse 6 93077 Lengfeld-bad Abbach / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08706896.1 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/22] | WO2008DE00290 | Priority number, date | DE20071009532 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007009532 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008104152 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062461 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062461 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H05B45/14 (EP,KR,US);
H05B45/37 (KR);
H05B45/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/08] |
Former [2009/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN, STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DER STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/22] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE CONTROL DEVICE | [2009/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6242870 (KOYANAGI HISAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 42 - line 59 * * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6356774 (BERNSTEIN MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US3705316 (BURROUS CLIFFORD N, et al); | [A]US5907569 (GLANCE BERNARD [US], et al) |