EP2121421 - TWO-PART GENERATOR FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reelight APS Hasselager Centervej 11, 1 8260 Viby J / DK | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Troels Ternevej 2 DK-2990 Nivå / DK | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2009/48] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 08706938.1 | 21.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008DK50044 | Priority number, date | DK20070000268 | 21.02.2007 Original published format: DK 200700268 | DK20070000485 | 29.03.2007 Original published format: DK 200700485 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008101507 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121421 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121421 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B62J6/06 (EP);
B62J6/20 (EP);
H02K7/1846 (EP);
H02K21/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | ZWEITEILIGER GENERATOR FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2009/48] | English: | TWO-PART GENERATOR FOR VEHICLES | [2009/48] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR EN DEUX PARTIES POUR VÉHICULES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2008 | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | HR | 07.11.2012 | IT | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MT | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | NO | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | IE | 21.02.2013 | LU | 21.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | IS | 07.03.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
NO | 07.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5128840 (SEKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-10,1,8-10,1,8-10 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,2,3,2,3; | [YD]EP1165361 (RELIGHT [DK]) [YD] 3,3,3 * page 18, line 18 - line 23; figures 11,12 * * page 18, line 18 - line 23; figures 11,12 * * page 18, line 18 - line 23; figures 11,12 *; | [Y]WO0133700 (RELIGHT [DK], et al) [Y] 2,2,2 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]JPS63107446 (AKAMATSU NORIO) [A] 1,1,1 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [A]DE102004011511 (BREITKOPF JULIUS [DE]) [A] 1,1,1 * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO0142079 (SCHUESSLER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1,1,1 * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE4229457 (MARKEN RENKE [DE]) [AD] 1,1,1 * figure -; claim 1 * * figure -; claim 1 * * figure -; claim 1 * | Examination | JPH10336981 | DE19908557 | by applicant | EP1165361 | DE4229467 |