EP2114757 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KTM Sportmotorcycle AG Stallhofnerstrasse 3 5230 Mattighofen / AT | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUNKENPOLZ, Johann Maria Schmolln 70 A-5241 Maria Schmolln / AT | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Söllner, Udo Patentanwalt Freundorferstrasse 34c 85598 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Söllner, Udo Patentanwaltskanzlei Udo Söllner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707191.6 | 22.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP00462 | Priority number, date | DE20071006167 | 07.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006167 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008095601 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2114757 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/00, B62M23/02, B62M7/12, B60K7/00, B60K6/20, B60K6/46 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
B62M7/02 (EP,US);
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B62M23/02 (EP,US);
B62M7/12 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG | [2009/46] | English: | VEHICLE | [2009/46] | French: | VÉHICULE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/27] | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYX]GB2265588 (SHIRLEY MICHAEL [GB]) [DY] 1-3,12,13,15,21 * the whole document * [X] 23; | [Y]US2006032689 (KOJIMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,12,13,15,21,22 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB332297 (ALEXANDER FARQUHARSON HENDERSO, et al) [Y] 22 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE102004010230 (FORSTER HORST [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2004071800 | DE4435613 | WO2005085630 | EP0437266 | DE19523985 | DE818737 | US2002148656 | DE20006252U |