Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
31.08.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.08.2011 | First examination report | |
24.08.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.04.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
04.03.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.09.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
10.09.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
29.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.08.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.08.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.08.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.03.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |