EP2237859 - BIOFILTER WITH DEFINED FLOW CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hakemann, Fritz Barnstorfer Str. 29 49424 Goldenstedt / DE | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Heim, Hans-Karl Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707472.0 | 31.01.2008 | [2010/41] | WO2008EP00785 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095035 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2237859 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/85 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
B01D53/85 (EP);
B01D2258/0266 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | BIOFILTER MIT DEFINIERTEN STRÖMUNGSKANÄLEN | [2010/41] | English: | BIOFILTER WITH DEFINED FLOW CHANNELS | [2010/41] | French: | BIOFILTRE À CANAUX D'ÉCOULEMENT DÉFINIS | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102006053910 (SCHEUCH GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9203062U (SCHOENHAMMER, JOHANN, 8317 MENGKOFEN, DE) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4112983 (SCHOENHAMMER JOHANN [DE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3423285 (FUCHS UWE) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102006002719 (SCHOENHAMMER MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]DE202007007620U (CHRISTIAN STOEHR GMBH & CO ELE [DE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004035839 (HAGOLA BIOFILTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,8,10-17,23 * claims 1,8,11,14,15,18-20 *; | [A]DE202005019599U (HARTMANN CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]DE10110519 (HARTMANN ANTON [DE]) [A] * the whole document * |