Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8060779 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2011 | B2 | US2010192008 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75871810 | 12.04.2010 | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101054962B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2011 | B1 | KR20090099529 | 22.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50032 | 03.01.2008 | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5182824B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2013 | B2 | JP2010515987 | 13.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50032 | 03.01.2008 | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2118750 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2016 | B1 | EP2118750 | 18.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50032 | 03.01.2008 | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101578586B | 12.12.2012 | B | CN101578586 | 11.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50032 | 03.01.2008 | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008084007 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7793148 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2010 | B2 | US2008172572 | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62299607 | 12.01.2007 |